OR HB3152 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits Public Utility Commission to institute one or more proceedings to ensure commission's regulations, rules and orders, and programs overseen by commission, align with greenhouse gas emissions reduction requirements and targets established by statute or executive order, do not impede or delay timely and equitable implementation of greenhouse gas emissions reduction requirements and targets, and mitigate energy burden and risks of stranded assets for residential utility customers. Permits Public Utility Commission to institute one or more proceedings to ensure commission's regulations, rules and orders, and programs overseen by commission, align with greenhouse gas emissions reduction requirements and targets established by statute or executive order, do not impede or delay timely and equitable implementation of greenhouse gas emissions reduction requirements and targets, and mitigate energy burden and risks of stranded assets for residential utility customers. Declares that policy of state is to protect residential utility customers from risks of stranded fossil fuel assets and potential increases in energy burden while achieving state's greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals. Prohibits, on or after January 1, 2026, use of funding from ratepayers to provide incentives or subsidies for the purchase or installation of gas appliances or devices for use by residential utility customers or line extension allowances for new gas line extensions that support use of gas in residential buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the reduction of greenhouse gas emissions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to Climate, Energy, and Environment.
2023-01-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3152
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3152/Introduced
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/22775
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23012
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23101
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/73374
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/263110
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/262952
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264784
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264099

Bill Comments

feedback