OR HB3152 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 500, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 500, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits dealer management system provider to condition dealer's or authorized integrator's access to and ability to receive, share, copy, use, write or transmit protected dealer data from or to dealer data system on dealer's or authorized integrator's compliance with security standards, require authorized integrator to have express written authorization from dealer before allowing authorized integrator to gain access to, receive, share, copy, use or transmit protected dealer data and deny access to dealer data system if dealer fails to pay amount due to dealer management system provider under lease, contract or other agreement. Prohibits authorized integrator, unless authorized integrator is acting in accordance with federal, state or local government law or under valid court order, from obtaining, sharing, selling, copying, transmitting, using, producing, generating or providing protected dealer data without dealer's prior express written consent or in manner that is inconsistent with dealer's prior express written consent and from locking out, deactivating or denying dealer access to dealer data system, permitting another person to obtain, share, sell, copy, transmit, use, produce, generate or provide protected dealer data without dealer's prior express written consent or charging fee for or otherwise prohibiting, preventing, restricting or limiting dealer's ownership, possession or use of protected dealer data.] Prohibits dealer management system provider from taking action to limit or prohibit dealer's or authorized integrator's ability to receive, protect, store, copy, share or use protected dealer data, including by imposing access fee or certain other restrictions on dealer or authorized integrator. Requires authorized integrator to obtain express written authorization from dealer and to comply with security standards before gaining access to, receiving, sharing, copying, using, writing or transmitting protected dealer data. Permits dealer to withdraw, revoke or amend prior express written consent] authorization at dealer's discretion after giving 30 days' prior notice or immediately for good cause.
Title
Relating to the protected dealer data of motor vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Transportation. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Transportation. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 500, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Transportation by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Transportation. |
2019-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |