OR HB3143 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Chapter 548, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Delays to December 15 date on which interest begins to accrue on first one-third of property taxes, and other related charges, not paid when due on November 15. Provides for daily rather than monthly computation of interest on delinquent property taxes. Permits county to authorize waiver or reduction of interest if taxpayer demonstrates good and sufficient cause for late payment. Defines "good and sufficient cause" as extraordinary circumstance beyond taxpayer's control that caused late payment.] Delays to December 15 date on which interest begins to accrue on first one-third of property taxes, and other related charges, not paid when due on November 15. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to interest charged on delinquent property taxes; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-30HouseChapter 548, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-16SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-06-10SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2021-06-09SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-26HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Revenue.
2021-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3143
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3143/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3143/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3143/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3143/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32655
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528649
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32946
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533011

Bill Comments 750

feedback