OR HB3141 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 547, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces public purpose charge for retail electricity consumers within service areas of electric companies and Oregon Community Power. Reduces public purpose charge for retail electricity consumers within service areas of electric companies and Oregon Community Power. Modifies allocation of funds collected through public purpose charges. Requires recovery in rates by electric company of funds necessary to plan for and pursue all available energy efficiency resources that are cost effective, reliable and feasible. Allows for credit against amounts recovered in certain circumstances. Modifies reporting requirements for nongovernmental entity that is paid certain funds as directed by commission. Requires Public Utility Commission to establish and update metrics for assessing, addressing and creating accountability for environmental justice in expenditure and investment of funds collected for certain purposes and paid to nongovernmental entity. Requires reporting by nongovernmental entity on progress in achieving equity metrics. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to energy; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 547, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
2021-06-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-25SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Smith G.
2021-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-15HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-15HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-08HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2021-03-23HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-17HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-10HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-15HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3141
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3141/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3141/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3141/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3141/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3141/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3141/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31443
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33058
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533721
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534708

Bill Comments

feedback