OR HB3141 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Revenue to establish program to identify taxpayers that are eligible for, but did not claim, earned income tax credit in preceding tax year and release to qualified nonprofit organization information that would enable qualified nonprofit organization to contact taxpayer, inform taxpayer of eligibility and assist taxpayer, if necessary, to apply for earned income tax credit. Requires department by rule to specify criteria for qualifying nonprofit organization. Requires qualified nonprofit organization that has entered into contract or agreement under terms of which nonprofit organization or any other party to contract or agreement will receive compensation from taxpayer or taxpayer's earned income tax credit to submit contract or agreement to department for review as condition of receiving information from department. Requires department to specify certain amendments to contract or agreement and requires qualified nonprofit organization to submit executed copy of contract or agreement for department to verify that amendments were incorporated. Permits department to impose civil penalty in amount that does not exceed $5,000 for each instance of violation of certain provisions of Act. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2017. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to information concerning eligible claimants for earned income tax credits; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB3141 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3141/Introduced |