OR HB3139 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 274, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 274, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Arts Commission to establish policies and procedures that ensure Arts Program considers regional differences in public access to, or opportunities for engagement in, arts and cultural development when determining eligibility for grant awards and that promote investment in communities where opportunities for engagement in arts and cultural development are limited. Requires Oregon Arts Commission to suggest rules to Director of Oregon Business Development Department for grant programs administered by Arts Program.
Title
Relating to the Arts Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 274, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Absent, 1--Helm. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Greenlick, Sprenger. |
2017-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-12 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |