OR HB3138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 372, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 372, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends time for filing of estate tax return . Extends time for filing of estate tax return as applicable to estate owing no federal estate tax]. Applies to estates of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to due date of estate tax return; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 372, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-05-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Clem, Hayden, Lively, Nearman, Stark. |
2021-05-12 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |