OR HB3138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 499, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 499, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that exemption from transient lodging taxation for dwelling unit used by members of general public for temporary human occupancy for fewer than 30 days per year does not apply to dwelling unit rented out as transient lodging using platform of any kind provided in any manner by transient lodging intermediary. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transient lodging taxation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 499, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Carried over to 06-17 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 4--Hayden, Post, Stark, Wallan. |
2019-05-28 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |