OR HB3136 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person who operates motor vehicle upon premises open to public or highways of this state is deemed to have given consent to submit to drug recognition evaluation under certain circumstances. Provides that person who operates motor vehicle upon premises open to public or highways of this state is deemed to have given consent to submit to drug recognition evaluation under certain circumstances. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to driving while under the influence of intoxicants; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3136 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3136/Introduced |