OR HB3136 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 600, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Revenue to collect, on local rather than regional level, local transient lodging taxes that department collects under agreements with units of local government. Requires department to fund actual start-up costs for collection on local level by withholding, in amount not to exceed $900,000, state transient lodging tax moneys that would otherwise be transferred to Oregon Tourism Commission. Requires department to reimburse commission, with interest, from reimbursement charges that would be withheld from state and local transient lodging tax revenues by transient lodging intermediaries but for disallowance of such charges under Act. Requires department to notify Legislative Counsel after department has fully reimbursed commission. Provides for refunds by department to transient lodging intermediaries of amounts received in excess of $900,000 that would otherwise have been withheld by intermediaries as collection reimbursement charge. Requires department, for purpose of enforcing state transient lodging tax, to purchase access to raw metadata scraped from Internet relating to sale, service or furnishing of transient lodging. Requires department to implement enhanced data-scraping pilot program with two to four units of local government for which department enforces local transient lodging tax. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of local transient lodging taxes by the Department of Revenue; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01HouseChapter 600, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
2019-07-23HouseGovernor signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-07-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Clem.
2019-06-20HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2019-06-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-11HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-11HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-05HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2019-05-23HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2019-05-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-05-21HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-05HouseReferred to Revenue.
2019-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3136
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3136/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3136/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3136/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3136/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3136/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3136/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29589
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30007
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477007
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=477995

Bill Comments

feedback