OR HB3133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases total amount allowed in tax year to all taxpayers as tax credits for donations to fiduciary organizations for distribution to individual development accounts. Increases maximum percentage of taxpayer donation for which credit may be allowed. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019, and before January 1, 2022. Updates and makes technical corrections to statutes governing individual development accounts. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to individual development accounts; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3133 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3133/Introduced |