OR HB3128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that persons employed by participating public employers may not become members of pension program or individual account program of Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan on or after January 1, 2020.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Public Service Retirement Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 20 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-02 | House | Motion to withdraw from Business and Labor failed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 37--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Hernandez, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lively, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Meek, Mitchell, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Piluso, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Wilde, Williams, Williamson, Witt; Excused, 3--Barker, Lewis, Sprenger. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |