OR HB3126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 546, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs county board to annex to domestic water supply district, upon petition, land surrounded by district where water supply has become inadequate or contaminated due to wildfire, if district or independent water supply source of district has water supply sufficient to provide water to land. Directs Legislative Policy and Research Office to study strategies to promote recovery from 2020 wildfire season and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Directs county board to annex to domestic water supply district, upon petition, land surrounded by district where water supply has become inadequate or contaminated due to wildfire, if district or independent water supply source of district has water supply sufficient to provide water to land. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wildfire recovery; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 546, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-06-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-06-14SenateReferred to Rules.
2021-06-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Moore-Green, Nearman.
2021-06-09HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-07HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-28HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery.
2021-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3126
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3126/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3126/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3126/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3126/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32766
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=529638
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33016
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533010

Bill Comments

feedback