OR HB3123 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that certain public bodies and intergovernmental entities may not issue bonds to finance pension liabilities without first obtaining independent assessment of likelihood that investment returns on bond proceeds will exceed interest cost of bonds and issuing public report relating to proposed bond issuance. Provides that certain public bodies and intergovernmental entities may not issue bonds to finance pension liabilities without first obtaining independent assessment from independent registered municipal advisor of advisability of proposed bond issuance] of likelihood that investment returns on bond proceeds will exceed interest cost of bonds and issuing public report relating to proposed bond issuance. Requires State Treasurer to provide annual report to State Debt Policy Advisory Commission on interest rates and rate of return on bonds that are issued on or after effective date of Act to finance pension liabilities and that remain outstanding. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to bonds to finance pension liabilities; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-05-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2019-05-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-05-13HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Rules.
2019-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback