OR HB3121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires voter registration cards and electronic voter registration system to include option for person to identify race, ethnicity and preferred language of person. Provides that any identification information provided is public record. Requires each county to identify five most common languages spoken by residents of county. Requires Secretary of State and county to provide elector with voters' pamphlet in elector's preferred language if elector has identified preferred language as part of voter registration and preferred language is one of five languages identified by county. Applies to voters' pamphlets distributed on or after January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to election materials; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Dan Rayfield [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3121 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3121/Introduced |