OR HB3120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 168, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 24, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 168, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 24, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that individual may not be disqualified for unemployment insurance benefits for voluntarily leaving work, failing to apply for available suitable work or failing to accept suitable work, if individual or member of individual's immediate family was victim of conduct that, in determination of Director of Employment Department, more likely than not constitutes crime of intimidation, individual believes that individual or immediate family member could become victim of such conduct or individual seeks to protect individual or immediate family member from such conduct that individual reasonably believes will occur as a result of individual's continued employment or acceptance of work. Provides that individual may not be disqualified for unemployment insurance benefits for voluntarily leaving work, failing to apply for available suitable work or failing to accept suitable work, if individual or member of individual's immediate family was victim of conduct that, in determination of Director of Employment Department, more likely than not constitutes crime of intimidation, individual believes that individual or immediate family member could become victim of crime of intimidation] such conduct or individual seeks to protect individual or immediate family member from crime of intimidation] such conduct that individual reasonably believes will occur as a result of individual's continued employment or acceptance of work. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to disqualification for unemployment insurance benefits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 168, (2019 Laws): Effective date May 24, 2019. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hernandez. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, Marsh. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |