OR HB3120 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 172, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 172, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Department of Transportation must designate vehicle dealer as agent. Specifies that department may impose penalties against vehicle dealers who do not comply with regulations related to vehicle dealers acting as agents of department.
Title
Relating to vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 172, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | DeBoer declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Carried over to 05-17 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Wilson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boone, Lininger, McKeown, Piluso. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |