OR HB3115 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes sunset on provisions that allow foreign exchange students residing in dormitories to be considered resident students for purpose of State School Fund distributions.
Title
Relating to resident status of foreign exchange students residing in dormitories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |