OR HB3111 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Chapter 50, (2023 Laws): Effective date May 8, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Chapter 50, (2023 Laws): Effective date May 8, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from public disclosure personal information of employees and retirees maintained by retirement system operated by local government. Exempts from public disclosure personal information of employees and retirees maintained by retirement system operated by local government. Clarifies that personal information of employees and volunteers of public body is exempt from disclosure regardless of record in which information is maintained. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public records; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Chapter 50, (2023 Laws): Effective date May 8, 2023. |
2023-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Carried over to 04-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Carried over to 04-19 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Carried over to 04-13 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Carried over to 04-12 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Carried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Carried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Carried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Carried over to 04-04 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Carried over to 04-03 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Carried over to 03-30 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Carried over to 03-29 by unanimous consent. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-02-28 | House | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 51; Excused, 9--Breese-Iverson, Chaichi, Cramer, Gamba, Hartman, Helfrich, Kropf, Marsh, Nelson. |
2023-02-23 | House | Carried over to February 28, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2023-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. |
2023-02-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-01-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |