OR HB3111 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to contract with at least four Recovery Community Organizations, in accordance with criteria adopted by Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission, to operate four recovery community centers in four different counties. Requires Oregon Health Authority to contract with at least four Recovery Community Organizations, in accordance with criteria adopted by Alcohol and Drug Policy Commission, to operate four recovery community centers in four different counties. Defines "Recovery Community Organization" and "recovery community center." Specifies requirements for centers. Requires authority to appoint Recovery Manager to be responsible for developing and maintaining network of Recovery Community Organizations. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to supportive services for individuals in recovery from substance use disorders; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |