OR HB3106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 140, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 140, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Early Learning Hubs to convene annual meetings between representatives of preschool programs administered by Early Learning Division for purpose of coordinating enrollment of eligible children in programs. Authorizes Early Learning Council to allow for provision of half-day prekindergarten program or full-day kindergarten program, as necessary to meet community needs.
Title
Relating to the preschool program administered by the Early Learning Division.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 140, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Boone, Clem, Gorsek, Hack, Keny-Guyer. |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Family Supports. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |