OR HB3104 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Secretary of State to study how to improve campaign finance reporting in this state. Requires Secretary of State to study how to improve campaign finance reporting in this state. Directs secretary to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to elections not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-01-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |