OR HB3098 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to create, maintain and raise public awareness of database of veterans' services providers and other supports. Directs Department of Veterans' Affairs to create, maintain and raise public awareness of database of veterans' services providers and other supports.
Title
Relating to veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Boomer Wright [R] | Rep. Rick Lewis [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3098 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3098/Introduced |