OR HB3095 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to conduct study related to unified data system and state reporting requirements. Directs Department of Education to conduct study related to unified data system and state reporting requirements. Requires department to report results of study to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Sunsets December 31, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to education data collection; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3095 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3095/Introduced |