OR HB3094 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Home Weatherization, Retrofit and Affordability Program for Housing and Community Services Department to provide incentive payments to construction contractors undertaking energy improvement projects on residential structures. Requires contractors to reduce property owners' costs by amount of incentive payments received. Reserves moneys for activities promoting healthy, affordable housing environments. Authorizes department to enter into agreements with other units of state government to operate home weatherization programs. Limits program expenditures. Sunsets program January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Housing and Community Services Department programs; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Energy and Environment, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Energy and Environment, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-22 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Energy and Environment, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-03-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |