OR HB3087 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates family and medical leave insurance program to provide covered employee with portion of wages while on family medical leave or military leave. Requires employer and employee contributions to fund program. Allows self-employed individuals to opt into program. Directs Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to determine contribution amounts and weekly benefit amounts. Establishes Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund. Amends Oregon family leave law to allow for leave after employee has been employed for 90 days with employer to match waiting period for benefits. Protects employee's position of employment with employer while employee is on leave. Prohibits employer from retaliating against employee who invokes program and from interfering with employee rights under program. Requires director to work with other agencies and promulgate rules for administration of program. Directs Department of Revenue to administer collection and reporting requirements of contribution provisions. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to family medical leave insurance benefits; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2017-04-24 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Family Supports with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |