OR HB3087 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits amount of appeal fee that city or county may charge for quasi-judicial review of city or county decisions on land use application.
Title
Relating to fees for appeal of local land use decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2013-03-18 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2013-03-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Land Use with subsequent referral to Judiciary. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |