OR HB3084 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits tax on use of suitable material other than virgin material for daily cover at disposal site.
Title
Relating to alternative daily cover.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |