OR HB3083 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that specifications for public improvement contracts and contracts for public works must require adherence to current seismic safety standards and seismic rehabilitation standards in constructing, reconstructing or performing major renovation on public building or critical infrastructure that is or will be located in area of state that is susceptible to seismic events. Provides that specifications for public improvement contracts and contracts for public works must require adherence to current seismic safety standards and seismic rehabilitation standards in constructing, reconstructing or performing major renovation on public building or critical infrastructure that is or will be located in area of state that is susceptible to seismic events. Requires contracting agency to consult with Seismic Safety Policy Advisory Commission to determine if public improvement or public works is or will be located in area of state that is susceptible to seismic events. Requires contracting agency to consult with Department of Consumer and Business Services and local government to determine applicable seismic safety and seismic rehabilitation standards. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to requirements for adherence to applicable seismic standards in certain public contracts; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3083 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3083/Introduced |