OR HB3082 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Board of Education to adopt rules requiring provision of fluoride rinse to certain students after certain meals.
Title
Relating to dental care for children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |