OR HB3078 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Oregon State Lottery from offering games playable via mobile phone, personal computer or other personal electronic device, except for certain sports betting and multistate numbers drawing lottery games. Prohibits Oregon State Lottery from offering games playable via mobile phone, personal computer or other personal electronic device, except for certain sports betting and multistate numbers drawing lottery games.
Title
Relating to limitations on gambling using personal electronic devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-02-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3078 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3078/Introduced |