OR HB3077 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 171, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 171, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits defense attorney, or district attorney if defendant is not represented by attorney, from disclosing to defendant victim's electronic mail address and social media account identifying information unless court authorizes or orders disclosure. Authorizes law enforcement agency to notify victim of victim's rights electronically.
Title
Relating to crime victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 171, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Barker, Bynum, Heard, Kennemer, McLain, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |