OR HB3077 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 171, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits defense attorney, or district attorney if defendant is not represented by attorney, from disclosing to defendant victim's electronic mail address and social media account identifying information unless court authorizes or orders disclosure. Requires court, upon request of crime victim, to order that] Prohibits defense attorney, or district attorney if defendant is not represented by attorney, from disclosing to defendant victim's electronic mail address and social media account identifying information not be given to defendant unless good cause is shown] unless court authorizes or orders disclosure. Authorizes law enforcement agency to notify victim of victim's rights electronically.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crime victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseChapter 171, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
2017-05-25HouseGovernor signed.
2017-05-22SenatePresident signed.
2017-05-22HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-05-18SenateThird reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2017-05-17SenateSecond reading.
2017-05-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2017-05-11SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2017-05-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-04-27HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith Db.
2017-04-27HouseThird reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed.Ayes, 53; Excused, 6--Barker, Bynum, Heard, Kennemer, McLain, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2017-04-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar.
2017-04-25HouseSecond reading.
2017-04-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2017-04-14HouseWork Session held.
2017-04-03HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2017-02-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback