OR HB3076 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends safe surrender period for anonymously leaving infant at authorized facility to 60 days from infant's date of birth. Extends safe surrender period for anonymously leaving infant at authorized facility to 60 days from infant's date of birth. Directs Department of Human Services] authorized facility to post and maintain signs informing public of authorized facilities and safe surrender provisions. Appropriates moneys to department for purpose of designing and posting signs.] Directs Department of Human Services to design signs that must be posted.
Title
Relating to anonymous surrenders of infants.
Sponsors
Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Shelly Boshart Davis [R] | Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. James Hieb [R] |
Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Lieber, Steiner, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Weber. Bill failed. Ayes, 15; Nays, 13--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Meek, Robinson, Smith DB, Thatcher, Weber; Excused, 2--Girod, Gorsek. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Cate. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Nguyen H, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Helm. |
2023-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2023-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services. |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |