OR HB3073 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10)
Status: Passed on July 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-27 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Changes name of Early Learning Division to Department of Early Learning and Care. Changes name of Early Learning Division to Department of Early Learning and Care. Establishes Department of Early Learning and Care as state agency that is separate from Department of Education and that functions under, and is coordinated by, Early Learning Council. Prescribes expanded duties, functions and powers of Department of Early Learning and Care, including administration of Employment Related Day Care. Modifies requirements of Employment Related Day Care. Directs Early Learning Division, Department of Education and Department of Human Services to develop and implement plans for seamless transfer of relevant duties, functions and powers, and to report on plans to appropriate interim committees of Legislative Assembly. Revises goals of statewide early learning system. Modifies membership and duties of State Interagency Coordinating Council. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to early childhood governance; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the C-Eng bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed D-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill. (Printed C-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Rules, then to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-27HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26HouseRules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 48; Nays, 8--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 3--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G.
2021-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr.
2021-06-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the C-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed D-Eng.)
2021-06-26SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2021-06-25SenateRecommendation: Do pass the C-Eng. Referred to Rules by order of the President. (Printed C-Eng.)
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-25SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Power, Zika. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Morgan, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 1--Smith G.
2021-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2021-06-21HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-21HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-18HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-29HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass as amended and be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Rules, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-04-12HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-15HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Early Childhood with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3073
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/House%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/D-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3073/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31944
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32169
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33117
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533719
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33282
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534829
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534889

Bill Comments 750

feedback