OR HB3071 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to study effects of social media and cell phone use among youth. Requires Oregon Health Authority to study effects of social media and cell phone use among youth. Directs authority to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health not later than March 15, 2024. Directs authority to develop and maintain educational resources to assist public with issues associated with excessive use of social media and cell phones. Directs Department of Education to collect data on school cell phone use policies and produce manual of best practices for school cell phone use policies. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of technology by youth; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-20HouseReferred to Early Childhood and Human Services.
2023-01-17HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback