OR HB3069 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands infrastructure of, access to and services provided in statewide coordinated crisis services system including 9-8-8 suicide prevention and behavioral health crisis hotline. Establishes] Expands infrastructure of, access to and services provided in statewide coordinated crisis services system including 9-8-8 suicide prevention and behavioral health crisis hotline. Imposes unspecified tax on consumers and retail subscribers who have telecommunications service or interconnected Voice over Internet Protocol service to pay for crisis services system.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to behavioral health; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-06-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |