OR HB3067 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues relating to foreclosure mitigation and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues relating to foreclosure mitigation and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets December 31, 2022.
Title
Relating to foreclosure mitigation.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3067 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3067/Introduced |