OR HB3067 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 672, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 672, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Marion and Polk Counties to establish pilot CourtCare programs to provide quality child care to individuals and families who are participating in court proceedings at local courthouse or transacting business at local governmental office. Requires pilot CourtCare program to also serve as clearinghouse for information and resource referrals relating to family support services in local community. Requires county that establishes pilot CourtCare program to enter into agreement with nonprofit or nongovernmental entity to implement and administer program. Directs county governing bodies to report on progress of pilot CourtCare programs no later than September 15, 2019. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to counties to implement pilot CourtCare programs. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to family supports; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 672, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Family Supports. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |