OR HB3064 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to study issues related to transportation finance and to report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Department of Transportation to study issues related to transportation finance and to report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to transportation finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3064 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3064/Introduced |