OR HB3062 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to study and make recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than September 15, 2022, for legislative changes needed to increase access to health care for all Oregonians. Requires Oregon Health Authority to study and make recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than September 15, 2022, for legislative changes needed to increase access to health care for all Oregonians. Sunsets January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |