OR HB3060 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes tax credit against personal income taxes for purchase of qualifying gun safes or locking mechanisms. Establishes tax credit against personal income taxes for purchase of qualifying gun safes or locking mechanisms. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, and before January 1, 2030. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a tax credit for gun safes; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-01-20HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Tax Expenditures.
2023-01-17HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback