OR HB3059 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 427, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - Chapter 427, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Disaster Response Assistance Matching Fund. Establishes Oregon Disaster Response Assistance Matching Fund. Provides that moneys in fund may be used to issue grants to local governments to make matching contributions necessary to access federal aid or issue grants to assist or support disaster response efforts. Requires Legislative Revenue Officer to study granting tax benefit to emergency management volunteers. Directs officer to submit report of findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to revenue not later than September 15, 2024. Establishes Compliance Division within Oregon Department of Emergency Management to ensure compliance with requirements and regulations relating to moneys received from federal government. Expands statute allowing certain public bodies to grant paid leave of absence to public employee who volunteers to participate in disaster relief or recovery services in state. Directs department to provide technical assistance to local entities that are active in emergency preparedness, response or recovery. Directs department to issue grants for support of community organizations active in disaster in Oregon. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to emergency management; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Tom Andersen [D] | Rep. Ben Bowman [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] |
Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D] | Rep. Hai Pham [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | House | Chapter 427, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 27, 2023. |
2023-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Manning Jr, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Carried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Bynum, Tran; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Breese-Iverson, Morgan. |
2023-06-13 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2023-06-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-06-01 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |