OR HB3059 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 250, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 250, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies statute authorizing law enforcement officers to command dispersal of unlawful assemblies and arrest participants who do not disperse. Repeals] Modifies statute authorizing law enforcement officers to command dispersal of unlawful assemblies and arrest participants who do not disperse. Removes requirement to go among persons unlawfully assembled and arrest persons. Authorizes arrest for unlawful activity constituting offense.
Title
Relating to unlawful assemblies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 250, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Heard, Kennemer, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Noble, Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-20 | House | Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-20 Calendar. |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |