OR HB3058 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Department of Agriculture to review current scientific data regarding safety of pesticide products containing chlorpyrifos. Prohibits sale, purchase or use of pesticide chlorpyrifos.] Requires State Department of Agriculture to place pesticide products containing neonicotinoid on list of restricted-use pesticides.] Requires department to report findings and recommendations to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than January 1, 2020. Requires department to review data for registered pesticide products containing chlorpyrifos and add additional restrictions as warranted. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to pesticides; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2019-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |