OR HB3056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality to issue clean fuels program credits to qualified credit generator that are equal to the value of unused transportation project tax credits. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to issue clean fuels program credits to qualified credit generator that are equal to the value of unused transportation project tax credits. Requires credit generator and department to enter into agreement concerning use of proceeds of clean fuels program credits issued under Act and retirement of certain clean fuels program credits. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to clean fuels program credits; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-06-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |