OR HB3052 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Elk and Deer Damage Compensation Funding. Requires Department of State Lands to study natural resources in Oregon. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to natural resources no later than September 15, 2024.] Establishes Task Force on Elk and Deer Damage Compensation Funding. Sunsets task force on January 2, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to natural resources; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-04-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Agriculture, Land Use, Natural Resources, and Water. |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |