OR HB3049 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that person may not operate unmanned aircraft system over privately owned premises in manner so as to harass or unreasonably annoy owner or occupant of premises. Provides exception. Makes violation punishable by maximum of $1,000 fine. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to unmanned aircraft systems; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 49; Nays, 11--Barreto, Buehler, Evans, Hack, Helm, Parrish, Piluso, Post, Power, Reschke, Stark. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |