OR HB3047 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies juvenile court dependency procedure to require any party issuing summons to bear financial responsibility for certain costs arising out of issuance of summons.
Title
Relating to juvenile court costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |