OR HB3046 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 629, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 629, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies behavioral health treatment that must be provided by coordinated care organizations and covered by group health insurance and individual health plans and restricts utilization review criteria for behavioral health treatment. Specifies behavioral health treatment that must be provided by coordinated care organizations and covered by group health insurance and individual health plans and restricts utilization review criteria for behavioral health treatment. Requires carriers and coordinated care organizations to conduct analyses of compliance with mental health parity requirements and report specified data to Department of Consumer and Business Services and Oregon Health Authority respectively.
Title
Relating to behavioral health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 629, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Boquist, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Drazan, Smith Warner, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |